Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471819 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471819



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 122
30.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
30.07.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 8
30.07.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
30.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
29.01.2019 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 6
07.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
03.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
26.10.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
21.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
21.12.2017 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 76