Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471819


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.11.2019 Change - representative
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
31.07.2019 Amendment by applicant
28.06.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
26.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
13.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
17.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.01.2019 Change - representative
07.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
09.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
28.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication