Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472807

EP3472807 - AUTOMATICALLY IDENTIFYING AND DISPLAYING OBJECT OF INTEREST IN A GRAPHIC NOVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Google LLC
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / HARTRELL, Greg
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
02 / CONBOY, Garth
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
03 / DUGA, Brady
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
04 / GU, Xinxing
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
05 / BEAVERS, Adeline
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
06 / GHOSH, Debajit
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
07 / RIVLIN, John
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
08 / NEWBERGER, Alan
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
09 / AN, Tae Wan
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
10 / MOON, Jacob
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
11 / SALVARANI, Christopher
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
12 / BLASS, Karl
c/o Google Inc.
1600 Amphitheatre Parkway
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date16905682.721.12.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US68117
Priority number, dateUS20161518620817.06.2016         Original published format: US201615186208
[2019/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017218043
Date:21.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472807
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR21.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06T11/60
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHE IDENTIFIZIERUNG UND ANZEIGE EINES OBJEKTS VON INTERESSE IN EINEM BILDROMAN[2019/17]
English:AUTOMATICALLY IDENTIFYING AND DISPLAYING OBJECT OF INTEREST IN A GRAPHIC NOVEL[2019/17]
French:IDENTIFICATION ET AFFICHAGE AUTOMATIQUES D'UN OBJET D'INTÉRÊT DANS UN NOUVEAU GRAPHIQUE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase14.12.2018National basic fee paid 
14.12.2018Search fee paid 
14.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2014042051  (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * p. 4, last paragraph starting at "The content input unit", l. 1-2. p. 7, 2nd paragraph and p. 8, last paragraph. p. 9, 1st paragraph, lines 1-3 and p. 10, 1st paragraph. p. 5, 1st and 2nd paragraph. p. 1, 2nd paragraph, lines 5-9. * [I] 8,9;
 [XI]US2012196260  (NHIAYI KAO [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,10,11 * [0015], lines 7-8 and Fig. 4C, item 446. [0015], lines 9-11. [0015], lines 16-20 and [0016], lines 1-4. [0033] and [0045] lines 14-18. [0015], lines 23-26 and [0057] last 4 lines, and [0058], lines 7-11. [0015], lines 9-12. [0047]. * [I] 8,9;
 [XI]US2013282376  (NONAKA SHUNICHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-5,10,11 * [0037], lines 2-4. [0037], line 7-9. [0037], lines 9-15 and [0089], lines 4-8. [0062], lines 1-3, [0063] and [0068] and [0070]. [0106], lines 1-2 and [0131] and [0088], lines 3-8. [0090], lines 7-8. [0019].[0037]. [0090] lines 8-13. * [I] 8,9;
 [A]  - WANG YONGTAO ET AL, An R-CNN Based Method to Localize Speech Balloons in Comics, INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SIMULATION, MODELING, AND PROGRAMMING FOR AUTONOMOUS ROBOTS,SIMPAR 2010; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 444 - 453, (20160103), ISBN 978-3-642-17318-9, XP047343390 [A] 1-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-319-27671-7_37
International search[Y]US2008301578  (OLSON PETER JONATHAN [US]) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0029],[0057],[0077],[0104], claims 1-6,16-19 and figures 1,4-7. *;
 [Y]US2014258911  (PALLAKOFF MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0040],[0043]-[0046], claims 1-6,13-17 and figures 3-4,11-12. *;
 [A]JP2007226255  (CELSYS KK) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1,4 and figures 2-8. *;
 [A]JP2007164550  (CORE COLORS INC) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1,5-9 and figures 4-6. *;
 [A]US2013283157  (EBATA TETSURO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * See claims 1-10 and figures 1-8B. *