Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473897

EP3473897 - END SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Joint Stock Company "Central Design Bureau of Machine Building"
nab.Obvodnogo kanala 138 k.1
lit.B
St.Peterburg 190020 / RU
For all designated states
Joint Stock Company "Science and Innovations"
Staromonetniy per. 26
Moscow 119180 / RU
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / AGRINSKIY, Andrey Nikolaevich
ul. Rikharda Zorge 7 k.1 kv. 7
St.Petersburg 198328 / RU
02 / VORONOV, Timur Dmitrievich
ul. Matrosa Zheleznyaka 37 kv. 61
St.Petersburg 197343 / RU
03 / GORONKOV, Andrey Vladimirovich
Sireneviy bul. 8 k. 1 kv. 179
St.Petersburg 194352 / RU
04 / KAZANTSEV, Rodion Petrovich
pr. Lunacharskogo 38 kv. 289
St.Petersburg 194356 / RU
05 / SHCHUTSKIY, Sergey Yurevich
Serebristiy bul. 22 k. 1 kv. 316
St.Petersburg 197227 / RU
06 / KUZ'MIN, Aleksey Mikhaylovich
ul. Nekrasova 60 kv. 112
St.Petersburg 191014 / RU
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Friese Goeden Patentanwälte PartGmbB
Widenmayerstraße 49
80538 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905690.020.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016RU00373
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222404
Date:28.12.2017
Language:RU
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473897
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:F16J15/34, F04D29/08
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ENDABDICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:END SEAL[2019/17]
French:JOINT D'EXTRÉMITÉ[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2017Translation filed 
26.01.2018National basic fee paid 
26.01.2018Search fee paid 
26.01.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.01.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
26.01.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.06.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.201904   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]RU2084730  (TS K B MASH [RU]) [AD] 1-2;
 [A]SU1603115  (SELIKHOV VYACHESLAV L [SU], et al) [A] 1-2;
 [A]SU1556216  (MEDVEDEV L.F.) [A] 1-2
by applicantRU2084730