Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3473897 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3473897



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 47
02.08.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.02.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.01.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
10.01.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
29.01.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
28.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
28.12.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 1
28.12.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
28.12.2017 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 1
28.12.2017 Description Search / examination 3
28.12.2017 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.12.2017 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 8
28.12.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5