Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3473897


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.08.2019 Change: Validation states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
23.08.2019 Change - extension states published on  25.09.2019  [2019/39]
03.08.2019 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
05.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2019 Change - representative
25.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
02.07.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.02.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
31.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
30.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
24.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
12.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
29.12.2017 PCT data prior to European publication