Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3364729 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3364729



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 451
07.05.2024 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
07.05.2024 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
09.02.2024 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
09.02.2024 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 4
29.11.2023 Oral proceedings: change of venue Appeal 5
05.09.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
05.09.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
05.09.2023 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
05.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 3
05.09.2023 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
05.09.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
05.09.2023 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 11
19.06.2023 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 14
15.03.2023 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 3
10.03.2023 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
09.03.2023 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
14.04.2021 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
24.02.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
24.02.2021 Amended claims with annotations Appeal 4
24.02.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 01 Appeal 4
24.02.2021 Auxiliary request during appeals procedure - 02 Appeal 4
24.02.2021 Claims Appeal 4
24.02.2021 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 14
03.12.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
03.12.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 2
03.12.2020 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
18.11.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
29.10.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
20.10.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
20.10.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 30
20.10.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.10.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 3
20.10.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 4
20.10.2020 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 2
20.10.2020 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 16
20.10.2020 Means of redress Search / examination 2
19.10.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 30
19.10.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
19.10.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
19.10.2020 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
13.10.2020 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
12.10.2020 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 1
06.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.10.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
06.10.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
06.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.10.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 2
23.09.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 4
22.09.2020 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
05.08.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.08.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
05.08.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
05.08.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.08.2020 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
10.06.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
05.06.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
28.05.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
28.05.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
28.05.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 7
28.05.2020 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
28.05.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
08.04.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
02.04.2020 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
31.03.2020 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
31.03.2020 Annex to a communication Search / examination 7
31.03.2020 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
31.03.2020 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 2
14.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
14.01.2020 Claims Search / examination 4
14.01.2020 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
06.09.2019 Annex to a communication Search / examination 13
06.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
06.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
03.07.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
03.07.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
21.06.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
21.06.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.06.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
21.06.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
21.06.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
21.06.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
21.06.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.12.2018 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 European search opinion Search / examination 3
26.11.2018 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
26.11.2018 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
14.11.2018 Search started Search / examination 1
25.07.2018 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.07.2018 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
17.07.2018 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
27.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.06.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
25.01.2018 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
29.12.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
29.12.2017 Abstract Search / examination 1
29.12.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.12.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
29.12.2017 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
29.12.2017 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
29.12.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
29.12.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
29.12.2017 Description Search / examination 21
29.12.2017 Drawings Search / examination 7
29.12.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5