Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473381

EP3473381 - WATER JET MACHINE FOR CUTTING FLAT GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Peri Lamezon, Marcelo
Av. Pinho Araucária N°. 687
JD. Cidade Alta
86.803.-370 Apucarana-PR / BR
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)De Pablos Riba, Juan Ramon
Los Madrazo, 24
28014 Madrid / ES
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905699.102.08.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016BR00074
Priority number, dateBR20162015301U20.06.2016         Original published format: BR 202016015301 U
[2019/17]
Filing languagePT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219099
Date:28.12.2017
Language:PT
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473381
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:BR28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:B24C5/02
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:WASSERSTRAHLMASCHINE ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON FLACHGLAS[2019/17]
English:WATER JET MACHINE FOR CUTTING FLAT GLASS[2019/17]
French:MACHINE À JET D'EAU POUR LA COUPE DE VERRE PLAT[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase27.11.2018Translation filed 
11.10.2018National basic fee paid 
11.10.2018Search fee paid 
11.10.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
11.10.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.04.2017Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: BR
11.10.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.10.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
22.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4703591  (HERRINGTON RICHARD A [US], et al) [Y] 1 e 2 * FIG.1 *;
 [Y]WO2012165864  (AGLASS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 1 e 2 * FIGS. 1-3 *