Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474593

EP3474593 - ACCESS METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Lili
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / TENNY, Nathan Edward
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / STIRLING-GALLACHER, Richard
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / LI, Guorong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16905795.721.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN86603
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017219253
Date:28.12.2017
Language:ZH
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474593
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00, // H04W56/00
[2019/20]
Former International [2019/17]H04W28/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ZUGANGSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM[2019/17]
English:ACCESS METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF, ET SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase28.12.2018Translation filed 
02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
28.12.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP2448329  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1-3,8-11,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0071] * * figure 9 * [Y] 5,6,12,14 [I] 4,7,13;
 [XAY]US2015305065  (BAI WEI [CN], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0060] * [A] 2-4,7,8,10,11,13,15 [Y] 5,6,12,14;
 [XA]  - QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "Further details of RACH-less handover", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-164239_RACHLESS_HANDOVER, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105517 [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * [A] 2-8,10-15
International search[XY]CN101616443  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-7, 9-10, 18-25, 33-39, 41-42, 50-57 * , description, page 1, paragraphs 7-8 and page 5, paragraphs 2-7, and figures 1-2, description, page 1, paragraphs 7-8 and page 5, paragraphs 2-7, and figures 1-2 * [Y] 8, 11-17, 26-32, 40, 43-49, 58-64;
 [Y]CN102271418  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 8, 11-17, 26-32, 40, 43-49, 58-64 * , description. narasranhs [0057]-[0063] *;
 [A]US2012327856  (JUNG SOOJUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-64 * , the whole document *