Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472906

EP3472906 - IDENTIFICATION METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A RESONANCE OF A POWER GRID, AND GRID-CONNECTED UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Chia-Tse
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
02 / KIKUCHI, Akira
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
03 / OOHARA, Shinya
c/o Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16906346.821.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016JP69365
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221430
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472906
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
ClassificationInternational:H02J3/01, H02M7/48
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:IDENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINES RESONANZ EINES STROMNETZES UND NETZGEKOPPELTE EINHEIT[2019/17]
English:IDENTIFICATION METHOD FOR IDENTIFYING A RESONANCE OF A POWER GRID, AND GRID-CONNECTED UNIT[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'IDENTIFICATION PERMETTANT D'IDENTIFIER UNE RÉSONANCE D'UN RÉSEAU ÉLECTRIQUE, ET UNITÉ CONNECTÉE AU RÉSEAU[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.11.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
01.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2014125649  (FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.) [A] 1-13 * , (No Family) *
 [A]JP2001086646  (NTT FACILITIES, INC.) [A] 1-13 * , (No Family) *