Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473453

EP3473453 - PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR HEAVY LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / SAEKI Kentaro
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/17]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date16906358.305.12.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016JP86081
Priority number, dateJP2016012144920.06.2016         Original published format: JP 2016121449
[2019/17]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017221442
Date:28.12.2017
Language:JA
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473453
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60C9/18, B60C11/00, B60C9/20, B60C15/00
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:LUFTREIFEN FÜR SCHWERE LASTEN[2019/17]
English:PNEUMATIC TIRE FOR HEAVY LOADS[2019/17]
French:PNEUMATIQUE POUR CHARGES LOURDES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.12.2018Translation filed 
18.12.2018National basic fee paid 
18.12.2018Search fee paid 
18.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
18.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
27.09.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2014373992  (ISHIZAKA TAKAHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0029] - [0038] - [0070] - [0090]; figures 1,2,6,7 * [Y] 1-7,9 [I] 2,8;
 [XYI]US2012060995  (MARUOKA KIYOTO [JP]) [X] 1,3,6,9 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0121]; figure -; table 1 * [Y] 4,5,7,9 [I] 2;
 [IA]EP3028873  (CONTINENTAL REIFEN DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [I] 1,2,4,7,8 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4 * [A] 9;
 [YA]US2014238573  (HERTA KATIE [DE], et al) [Y] 3-7 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 * [A] 1;
 [YA]JPS49132705  (BRIDGESTONE TIRE, INC.) [Y] 1 * figure - * [A] 2-9;
 [YA]EP1800903  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0009] - [0044]; figure -; table - * [A] 2-8;
 [YA]US2015151582  (HAMANAKA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0135]; figure - * [A] 1;
 [A]US2009277557  (SUZUKI NOBUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * paragraph [0001]; table 1 *
International search[XY]JP2003211911  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1, 3, 6 * , paragraphs [0018], [0025], [0026], [0033]; fig. 4 (Family: none) * [Y] 2;
 [XY]JP2012061892  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [X] 1, 3, 6 * , paragraphs [0025], [0034], [0039]; fig. 4 & US 2012/0060995 A1 paragraphs [0050] to [0052], [0090], [0104] & CN 102398476 A * [Y] 2;
 [Y]WO2014010349  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2 * , paragraph [0121]; fig. 2 & US 2015/0114536 A1 paragraph [0128]; fig. 2 & CN 104395104 A & KR 10-2015-0038006 A *;
 [A]JPS5244902  (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012153193  (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2009012539  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2004276763  (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH03279432  (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [A] 1-9 * , entire text (Family: none) *