Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471535

EP3471535 - ANIMAL LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  29.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
23.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.09.2019 [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inguran, LLC
22575 State Highway 6 South
Navasota, TX 77868 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / FUNK, Ted L.
1808 Lyndhurst Drive
Savoy, Illinois 61874 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Jacob, Reuben Ellis , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16906433.421.06.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US38521
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2017222506
Date:28.12.2017
Language:EN
[2017/52]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471535
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2017
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.12.2017
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01K1/08, A01K13/00, A01K15/00, A01K15/04, A22B1/00, A22B5/00, A22B5/06
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:TIERAUFZUG[2019/17]
English:ANIMAL LIFT[2019/17]
French:SYSTÈME DE LEVAGE D'ANIMAL[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase13.12.2018National basic fee paid 
13.12.2018Search fee paid 
13.12.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
13.12.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2018Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
27.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US5441016  (RICKETTS TOD [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 2, line 30 - column 11, line 25; figures 1-23 * [A] 9 [I] 6-8;
 [XA]US1234733  (CORINGTON JAMES W [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 15; figures 1-5 * [A] 3-9;
 [A]US2009183690  (WINDERS MAX [US]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034]; figures 1-10 *;
 [A]US6477986  (KORJENIC HAMID [AU]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-13 *
International search[Y]US6477986  (KORJENIC HAMID [AU]) [Y] 1-9 * entire document *;
 [Y]AU2006235761B  (PETER BLACK, et al) [Y] 1-9 * entire document *;
 [Y]US5299658  (COX JOSEPH H [US], et al) [Y] 4-6, 8 * entire document *;
 [Y]US3541888  (HEGAR FRANK, et al) [Y] 7 * entire document *