Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469926

EP3469926 - FLAVOR INHALER CARTRIDGE AND FLAVOR INHALER HAVING FLAVOR INHALER CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.08.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
30.08.2019Change - extension statespublished on 02.10.2019 [2019/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tobacco, Inc.
2-1, Toranomon 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / NAKANO, Takuma
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
02 / MATSUMOTO, Hirofumi
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
03 / YAMADA, Manabu
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC.
17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16907222.027.06.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP69012
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018002989
Date:04.01.2018
Language:JA
[2018/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469926
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP04.01.2018
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00, A61M15/06
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:PATRONE FÜR GESCHMACKSINHALATOR UND GESCHMACKSINHALATOR MIT DER GESCHMACKSINHALATORPATRONE[2019/16]
English:FLAVOR INHALER CARTRIDGE AND FLAVOR INHALER HAVING FLAVOR INHALER CARTRIDGE[2019/16]
French:CARTOUCHE D'INHALATEUR D'ARÔME ET INHALATEUR D'ARÔME AYANT UNE CARTOUCHE D'INHALATEUR D'ARÔME[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2019Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
28.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]JP2014506486  (ResMed Ltd.) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0013] to [0145] & US 2013/0284169 A1 claims; paragraphs [0011] to [0161] & WO 2012/100291 A1 & EP 2667919 A & CN 103328031 A *;
 [X]JP2012506263  (Buchberger, Helmut) [X] 1-9 * , claims; paragraphs [0017] to [0099] & JP 2015-13192 A & US 2011/0226236 A1 claims; paragraphs [0021] to [0128] & US 2014/0283825 A1 & US 2014/0299125 A1 & WO 2010/045671 A1 & WO 2010/045670 A1 & EP 2358223 A & EP 2358418 A *;
 [X]JP2014525237  (R. J. Reynolds Tobacco Co.) [X] 1-9 * , paragraph [0074] & US 2013/0037041 A1 paragraph [0089] & US 2015/0272225 A1 & WO 2013/022936 A1 & EP 2741626 A & EP 3020291 A *;
 [X]JP2015506182  (Altria Client Services Inc.) [X] 1-9 * , paragraph [0023] & US 2013/0192623 A1 paragraph [0048] *;
 [A]JP2015524257  (Nicoventures Holdings Ltd.) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0196058 A1 & GB 2504075 A & WO 2014/012905 A1 *;
 [A]JP2014501131  (Koninklijke Philips N.V.) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0263845 A1 & WO 2012/080923 A1 & EP 2651482 A *;
 [A]JP2008545943  (Vapore, Inc.) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0220222 A1 & US 2011/0210458 A1 & WO 2006/124757 A2 *;
 [A]JP2012149282  (TOYAMA SUMITOMO DENKO KK) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2013/0295459 A1 & WO 2012/098941 A1 & EP 2666890 A1 & CN 103328693 A *;
 [A]JPH08232003  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5672387 A & US 5747112 A & EP 696649 A1 *;
 [A]JP2003119085  (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [A] 1-9 * , entire text; all drawings & JP 2005-272300 A & US 2005/0020431 A1 & US 2007/0032371 A1 & WO 2003/014042 A1 & EP 1449819 A1 & KR 10-2004-0032889 A *