Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471378

EP3471378 - VEHICLE EXTERNAL COMMUNICATION METHOD, DEVICE AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LIN, Yangbo
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Thun, Clemens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16908414.212.07.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CN89748
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018010083
Date:18.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471378
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, H04W4/44, H04W12/08, H04W12/06
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/16]H04L29/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGEXTERNES KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND ENDGERÄT[2019/16]
English:VEHICLE EXTERNAL COMMUNICATION METHOD, DEVICE AND TERMINAL[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATIONS EXTERNES POUR VÉHICULE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase09.01.2018Translation filed 
09.01.2019National basic fee paid 
09.01.2019Search fee paid 
09.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
09.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]CN102263831  (CHANGSHU INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-47 * , description, paragraphs [0006]-[0014] and [0022]-[0028], figures 1-5, and claims 1-7 *;
 [A]CN101340462  (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-47 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN103342119  (UNIV CHONGQING POSTS & TELECOM) [A] 1-47 * , the whole document *