Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471283

EP3471283 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SPECIFIC ABSORPTION RATIO OF WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 16.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
13.09.2019Change - extension statespublished on 16.10.2019 [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / LAN, Yuan-Hao
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LUNG, Hsingyu
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / HUANG, Chien-Jen
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / SHU, Haw-Wei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / HSU, Chih-Wei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16908429.012.07.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CN89828
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018010100
Date:18.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471283
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN18.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/04, H04B1/3827
[2019/27]
Former International [2019/16]H04B7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES SPEZIFISCHEN ABSORPTIONSVERHÄLTNISSES EINER DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG SOWIE DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2019/16]
English:METHOD FOR CONTROLLING SPECIFIC ABSORPTION RATIO OF WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU DÉBIT D'ABSORPTION SPÉCIFIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2019Translation filed 
14.01.2019National basic fee paid 
14.01.2019Search fee paid 
14.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[I]CN104426590  (ZTE CORP) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [I]US2012021800  (WILSON KELCE STEVEN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0042]; figures 2-5b * * claim 38 *;
 [A]WO2011058128  (IREX TECHNOLOGIES B V [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3 - page 6 * * page 12, line 31 - page 16, line 10; figures 3-4d *;
 [A]US2016098053  (KHAWAND CHARBEL [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN104426590  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1-29 * , description, paragraphs [0032] and [0038]-[0088] *;
 [A]CN102573126  (ACER INC) [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102570051  (COMPAL ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2012190398  (LEUKKUNEN MARKO J [FI]) [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *;
 [A]EP2424125  (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2016174168  (LU LIN [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *;
 [A]  - MICHAEL Y.K. et al., "Faster Determination of Mass-Averaged SAR From 2-D Area Scans", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MICROWAVE THEORY AND TECHNIQUES, (20040831), vol. 52, no. 8, pages 2013 - 2020, XP011115731 [A] 1-29 * , the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMTT.2004.832026