Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474614

EP3474614 - METHOD FOR SIGNAL TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan
Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TANG, Hai
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16909233.521.07.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN90910
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018014306
Date:25.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474614
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/18, H04W72/04
[2019/29]
Former International [2019/17]H04W72/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG, ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG[2019/17]
English:METHOD FOR SIGNAL TRANSMISSION, TERMINAL DEVICE AND NETWORK DEVICE[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase18.01.2019Translation filed 
18.01.2019National basic fee paid 
18.01.2019Search fee paid 
18.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
18.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
18.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2016040290  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) [X] 1-3,5-11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0147] - [0151] * * claims 1,6-10 * [A] 4,12 [I] 13;
 [XAI]CN104468030  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,4,12,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0289] - [0295] * [A] 2,3,5-11 [I] 13;
 [XAI]US2014071954  (AU KELVIN KAR KIN [CA], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0026] * [A] 2-12 [I] 13
International search[X]CN101087288  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO [CN]) [X] 1-27 * description, page 2, line 1 to page 3, line 4 and page 7, line 3 to page 9 line 11 and figure 2 *;
 [X]CN105025576  (SHANGHAI LANGBO COMM TECHNICAL CO LTD) [X] 1-27 * description, paragraphs [0088]-[0117], and figure 3 *;
 [A]CN101621359  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015184707  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *