Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471456

EP3471456 - CONGESTION CONTROL METHOD, BASE STATION, AND TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  26.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / SUN, Jizhong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / CHEN, Liang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16909287.122.07.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016CN91093
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018014360
Date:25.01.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471456
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN25.01.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/02
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ÜBERLASTUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION UND ENDGERÄT[2019/16]
English:CONGESTION CONTROL METHOD, BASE STATION, AND TERMINAL[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE CONGESTION, STATION DE BASE ET TERMINAL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2016033742  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11,14,15;
 EP3182646  [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0194] *;
 [XI]WO2015058406  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,10,12,13 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0085] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0149] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0223] - paragraph [0229] * * paragraph [0330] - paragraph [0352] * [I] 2-9,11,14,15;
 [XI]WO2013063832  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1,10,12,13 * page 1, line 8 - page 7, line 24 * [I] 2-9,11,14,15;
 [XI]US2014071815  (GU XINYU [CN], et al) [X] 1,10,12,13 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0127] * [I] 2-9,11,14,15;
 [XI]WO2015131544  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-9,11,14,15;
 EP3116274  [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0053] *;
 [A]  - INTEL CORPORATION ET AL, Use Case for MNO Configuration of V2X Message Transmission, 3GPP DRAFT; S1-152079 V2X MSG CHARACTERISTICS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20150809), XP050989977 [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 3 *
International search[X]CN104168601  (COMBA TELECOM SYSTEMS HOLDINGS) [X] 1-60 * , description, paragraphs [0033]-[0079] *;
 [X]CN105517054  (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1-60 * , description, paragraphs [0148]-[0205] *;
 [A]CN102281183  (ZTE CORP.) [A] 1-60 * , the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014117810  (NEC EUROPE LTD [DE]) [A] 1-60 * , the whole document *;
 [A]US2013150108  (YANG MI JEONG [KR], et al) [A] 1-60 * , the whole document *