Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474482

EP3474482 - PILOT SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL EQUIPMENT, AND NETWORK EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip02.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Guangdong OPPO Mobile Telecommunications Corp., Ltd.
No. 18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan
Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / TANG, Hai
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16910091.428.07.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN92102
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018018510
Date:01.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474482
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/02, H04L5/00
[2019/25]
Former International [2019/17]H04L5/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PILOTSIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄTEAUSRÜSTUNG UND NETZWERKAUSRÜSTUNG[2019/17]
English:PILOT SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, TERMINAL EQUIPMENT, AND NETWORK EQUIPMENT[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL PILOTE, ÉQUIPEMENT TERMINAL, ET ÉQUIPEMENT DE RÉSEAU[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2014269520  (YI ZHIHANG [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-15 * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] * * figures 1,5,6,7 * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * [A] 5 [I] 8;
 [XAI]US2015282123  (MIAO HONGLEI [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,13-15 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0044] * * figures 2,3 * [A] 6 [I] 8
International search[X]CN101390328  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [X] 1-34 * description, page 8, lines 22-29, page 12, lines 7-15 and page 14, lines 5-15 *;
 [A]CN101394262  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN1773976  (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2011025131  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-34 * the whole document *