blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3492871

EP3492871 - SELF-POSITION ESTIMATION METHOD AND SELF-POSITION ESTIMATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.03.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.04.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.
2, Takara-cho
Kanagawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP
[2019/23]
Inventor(s)01 / TAKANO, Hiroyuki
Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / SANO, Yasuhito
Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / TSUCHIYA, Chikao
Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / NANRI, Takuya
Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
 [2020/09]
Former [2019/23]01 / TAKANO, Hiroyuki
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
02 / SANO, Yasuhito
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
03 / TSUCHIYA, Chikao
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
04 / NANRI, Takuya
c/o Intellectual Property Department of
NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD.
1-1 Morinosato Aoyama
Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/23]
Application number, filing date16910492.426.07.2016
[2019/23]
WO2016JP71922
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018020589
Date:01.02.2018
Language:JA
[2018/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3492871
Date:05.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3492871
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP01.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:G01C21/30, G05D1/00, G08G1/16, G01S5/16, G06K9/00, G05D1/02, G01C21/36
[2019/36]
CPC:
G01C21/30 (EP,KR,RU,US); G01C21/1656 (RU,US); G01C21/1652 (EP,KR,RU,US);
G01C21/28 (US); G01C21/3602 (EP,US); G01D1/00 (KR);
G01S17/86 (EP); G01S17/931 (EP); G01S5/16 (US);
G01S7/4808 (EP); G05D1/00 (RU); G05D1/0248 (US);
G06V20/56 (EP); G06V20/588 (US); G08G1/16 (KR,RU) (-)
Former IPC [2019/23]G01C21/30, G05D1/00, G08G1/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:EIGENPOSITIONSCHÄTZUNGSVERFAHREN UND EIGENPOSITIONSCHÄTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2019/23]
English:SELF-POSITION ESTIMATION METHOD AND SELF-POSITION ESTIMATION APPARATUS[2019/23]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE POSITION AUTOMATIQUE ET APPAREIL D'ESTIMATION DE POSITION AUTOMATIQUE[2019/23]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2019Translation filed 
25.02.2019National basic fee paid 
25.02.2019Search fee paid 
25.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/23]
04.02.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.03.2020Fee for grant paid
26.03.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.03.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)09.02.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
25.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU26.07.2016
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MK06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
IE26.07.2020
LU26.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU26.07.2016
AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CY06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
MT06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
TR06.05.2020
IE26.07.2020
LU26.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/37]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
IE26.07.2020
LU26.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/24]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SI06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
LU26.07.2020
BE31.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/20]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
LU26.07.2020
CH31.07.2020
LI31.07.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/14]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
MC06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/10]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
PL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SK06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/09]AL06.05.2020
AT06.05.2020
CZ06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
EE06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
IT06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/08]AL06.05.2020
DK06.05.2020
ES06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RO06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
SM06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/04]AL06.05.2020
FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
NL06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
BG06.08.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
RS06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI06.05.2020
HR06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
LV06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
GR07.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI06.05.2020
LT06.05.2020
SE06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
PT07.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT06.05.2020
NO06.08.2020
IS06.09.2020
Former [2020/46]IS06.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]JP2008250906  (SOGO KEIBI HOSHO KK) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0047] - [0053] *;
 [A]US2009228204  (ZAVOLI WALTER B [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 3,4,6,8 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0041] , [0044] , [0054] , [0055] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0067] - [0074] , [0088] , [0090] , [0114] , [0115] *;
 [A]US2011205362  (SUZUKI SHUNSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] - [0010] - [0052] - [0058] - [0 88] - [0104] - [0107] ** figures 2,6,7,8 *;
 [A]US2015332100  (YAMAGUCHI ICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1,2,7 * * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] - [0045] - [0053] *;
 [A]US2015363653  (KASHIWAI TADAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] - [0050] - [0053] - [0056] * * figures 9,11 *
International search[A]JP2003252149  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2008250906  (SOGO KEIBI HOSHO KK) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0023] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012008706  (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0076] to [0077] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2012103858  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0013] (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2016017758  (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-7* , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.