blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3499773

EP3499773 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.03.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  17.11.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  17.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/25]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAO, Jiafeng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/25]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/25]Gill Jennings & Every LLP
MTH The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date16912373.412.08.2016
[2019/25]
WO2016CN94916
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018027918
Date:15.02.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3499773
Date:19.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3499773
Date:07.04.2021
Language:EN
[2021/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:H04L5/00, H04W52/28, H04W52/14, H04W52/34
[2019/25]
CPC:
H04W52/281 (EP,US); H04W52/146 (EP,KR,US); H04L5/00 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (KR,US); H04W52/16 (KR); H04W52/242 (KR);
H04W52/346 (EP,US); H04W52/50 (US); H04W72/1263 (KR);
H04W72/23 (US); H04W72/569 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG EINES UPLINK-KANALS[2019/25]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CHANNEL[2019/25]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRANSMISION DE CANAL DE LIAISON MONTANTE[2019/25]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2019Translation filed 
27.02.2019National basic fee paid 
27.02.2019Search fee paid 
27.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/25]
02.12.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.11.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.02.2021Fee for grant paid
24.02.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.02.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.01.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.08.2016
AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
MK07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
IE12.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/33]HU12.08.2016
AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
IE12.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2023/30]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CY07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
IE12.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/36]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
IT07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
IE12.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/35]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
IE12.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/34]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
BE31.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
FR31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/29]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SI07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/26]AL07.04.2021
AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/23]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
LU12.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
Former [2022/21]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
CH31.08.2021
LI31.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/18]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
MC07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/10]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
EE07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
IS22.12.2021
Former [2022/09]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RO07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SK07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/08]AT07.04.2021
CZ07.04.2021
DK07.04.2021
ES07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2022/07]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
SM07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/52]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
PL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/51]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
RS07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
IS07.08.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/50]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
PT09.08.2021
Former [2021/49]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
HR07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
LV07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
SE07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
NO07.07.2021
GR08.07.2021
Former [2021/47]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
NL07.04.2021
BG07.07.2021
Former [2021/46]AT07.04.2021
FI07.04.2021
LT07.04.2021
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2015282104  (DAMNJANOVIC JELENA [US], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraphs [0114] - [0116] * * figures 16,17 * [Y] 2-6,8-12;
 [XY]WO2015168906  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0027] * [Y] 2-6,8-12;
 [Y]  - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on UL RS for short TTI", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-164063, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051096621 [Y] 2,3,5,6,8,9,11,12 * page 1, paragraph 2 - page 2 *
 [Y]  - INTERDIGITAL, "Consideration on sPUSCH Design", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160513), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165052_SPUSCH, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160513), XP051096677 [Y] 4,10 * page 2, paragraph 2 *
 [A]  - ASUSTEK, "Impact of shortened TTI on uplink transmission", vol. RAN WG1, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160514), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-165249 IMPACT OF SHORTENED TTI ON UPLINK TRANSMISSION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_85/Docs/, (20160514), XP051096185 [A] 6,12 * page 1, paragraph 2. Impact on PUSCH *
International search[A]EP2493092  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013165570  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2015148001  (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]CN105531959  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - HUAWEI, "Discussion on ULRS for short TTI", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #85 Rl-164063, (20160527), XP051096621 [A] 1-32 * , the whole document *
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "New Work Item on shortened TTI and processing time for LTE", 3GPP TSG RAN Meeting #72 RP-161299, (20160616), XP055437809 [A] 1-32 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.