blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3500169

EP3500169 - A DEDICATED BREAST COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.08.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.09.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.06.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.05.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  24.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd.
B507, Block A and B
Nanshan Medical Device Industrial Park
Nanhai Avenue 1019
Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN
[2022/14]
Former [2020/21]For all designated states
Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd.
Suite 201, Building B52
Tanglang Industrial Area
No. 13 at No. Five Xinyi Road
Tanglang Community, Taoyuan Str., Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518071 / CN
Former [2020/07]For all designated states
Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd.
Suite 201, Building B52
Tanglang Industrial Area
No. 13 at No. Five Xinyl Road
Tanglang Community, Taoyuan Str., Nanshan District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518071 / CN
Former [2019/26]For all designated states
Shenzhen Xpectvision Technology Co., Ltd.
Room 201 Block A
No. 1 Qianwan Road 1
Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518054 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Peiyan
Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN
02 / DING, Rui
Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN
 [2022/40]
Former [2019/26]01 / CAO, Peiyan
Room 201, Block A
No. 1 Qianwan Road 1
Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN
02 / DING, Rui
Room 201, Block A
No. 1 Qianwan Road 1
Shenzhen-Hong Kong Cooperative District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518054 / CN
Representative(s)Beck Greener LLP
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HR / GB
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date16913216.418.08.2016
[2019/26]
WO2016CN95852
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018032459
Date:22.02.2018
Language:EN
[2018/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3500169
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2019/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3500169
Date:12.10.2022
Language:EN
[2022/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN22.02.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.08.2019
ClassificationIPC:A61B6/00, A61B6/03, A61B6/04
[2019/37]
CPC:
A61B6/502 (EP,US); A61B6/032 (EP,US); A61B6/0435 (EP,US);
A61B6/4233 (EP,US); A61B6/4241 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2019/26]A61B6/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DEDIZIERTES BRUSTCOMPUTERTOMOGRAPHIESYSTEM[2019/26]
English:A DEDICATED BREAST COMPUTED TOMOGRAPHY SYSTEM[2019/26]
French:SYSTÈME DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE SPÉCIALISÉ POUR MAMMOGRAPHIE[2022/24]
Former [2019/26]SYSTÈME DE TOMODENSITOMÉTRIE SPÉCIALISÉ POUR L'IMAGERIE DU SEIN (OU MAMMOGRAPHIE)
Entry into regional phase27.02.2019National basic fee paid 
27.02.2019Search fee paid 
27.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/26]
09.03.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.06.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2022Fee for grant paid
31.08.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
31.08.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.07.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 05
23.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2022Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
IT12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
MC12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
[2024/26]
Former [2024/16]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
MC12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/51]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SI12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/38]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SK12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/37]AL12.10.2022
AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/35]AT12.10.2022
CZ12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RO12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/34]AT12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
EE12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/33]AT12.10.2022
DK12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
SM12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/26]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
PL12.10.2022
RS12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
IS12.02.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/24]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
HR12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/23]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
LV12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
GR13.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/22]AT12.10.2022
ES12.10.2022
FI12.10.2022
LT12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
SE12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
PT13.02.2023
Former [2023/20]LT12.10.2022
NL12.10.2022
NO12.01.2023
Former [2023/17]NL12.10.2022
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]WO2007111912  (II VI INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010062291  (ANALOGIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document *;
 [A]WO2013005848  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2014196479  (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2015061735  (LEE KANG-HO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4, 6-16 * description paragraphs [0046], [0051], [0057], [0062]-[0066], [0090], [0098]-[0099], Figures 1,3-4, 6B *;
 [Y]WO2016092797  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-4, 6-16 * description paragraphs [0017]-[0019], figures 2A-2B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.