Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3466126

EP3466126 - ADAPTIVE RECEPTION OF CELL BROADCAST SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052 / US
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / LIU, Liyuan
c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D
Headquarters 14F
Building 2
No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District
Beijing 100080 / CN
02 / LI, Jian
c/o Microsoft Asia Pacific R&D
Headquarters 14F
Building 2
No. 5 Danling Street, Haidian District
Beijing 100080 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16914491.230.08.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN97364
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018039924
Date:08.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3466126
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN08.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/06, H04W52/02, H04W76/28
[2019/52]
Former International [2019/15]H04W4/06, H04W52/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
TitleGerman:ADAPTIVER EMPFANG VON ZELLRUNDFUNKDIENST[2019/15]
English:ADAPTIVE RECEPTION OF CELL BROADCAST SERVICE[2019/15]
French:RÉCEPTION ADAPTATIVE D'UN SERVICE DE DIFFUSION CELLULAIRE[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase04.01.2019National basic fee paid 
04.01.2019Search fee paid 
04.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
04.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
04.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
13.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
15.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]US2014348072  (MAY-WEYMANN ALEXANDER [FR]) [X] 1, 2, 8, 9, 15, 16 * description, paragraphs [0033]-[0053], claims 1-32description, paragraphs [0033]-[0053], claims 1-32 * [Y] 3-7, 10-14, 17-20;
 [Y]US2013265928  (MARTINEZ TARRADELL MARTA [US], et al) [Y] 3-7, 10-14, 17-20 * description, paragraphs [0021]-[0065] *;
 [A]CN104054361  (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2011201365  (SEGURA LOUIS [CA]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *