blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3474158 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3474158



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
06.08.2019 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
18.07.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 1
10.07.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
27.03.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
29.01.2019 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
15.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
15.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
15.01.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 10
15.01.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 14
15.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 14
15.01.2019 Description Search / examination 28
15.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 4
15.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.04.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
15.03.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
15.03.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 34