Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3474158

EP3474158 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING TASK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Beijing Baidu Netcom Science And Technology Co., Ltd.
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHANG, Yuncong
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
02 / WEN, Xiang
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
03 / WANG, Cong
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
04 / CHAI, Hua
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
05 / XU, Yao
2/F Baidu Campus
No.10 Shangdi 10th Street
Haidian District
Beijing 100085 / CN
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16915544.728.09.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016CN100514
Priority number, dateCN20161080393406.09.2016         Original published format: CN201610803934
[2019/17]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018045610
Date:15.03.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3474158
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN15.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F16/27
[2019/34]
Former International [2019/17]G06F17/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSFÜHRUNG VON VERTEILTEN DATENVERARBEITUNGSAUFGABEN[2019/17]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR EXECUTING DISTRIBUTED COMPUTING TASK[2019/17]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF D'EXÉCUTION DE TÂCHE INFORMATIQUE DISTRIBUÉE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019Translation filed 
15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]  - Anonymous, "Apache Spark", (20160831), pages 1 - 4, URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Apache_Spark&oldid=737123879, (20190710), XP055604002 [X] 1-6,11-15 * page 1 - page 2 * [I] 7-10
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Class DataFrameWriter", (20151226), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20151226104319/https://spark.apache.org/docs/latest/api/java/org/apache/spark/sql/DataFrameWriter.html, (20190710), XP055604010 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *