blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3415746

EP3415746 - VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.04.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.05.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.11.2018
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
[2018/51]
Inventor(s)01 / HIWATASHI, Keiichi
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
02 / UMETSU, Daisuke
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
03 / SUNAHARA, Osamu
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
04 / KIMOTO, Koichi
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
05 / TAKAHARA, Yasunori
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
06 / OGAWA, Daisaku
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
07 / OHISA, Chikako
c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun
Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
 [2018/51]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Uwe
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstraße 23
80538 München / DE
[2018/51]
Application number, filing date16915722.909.09.2016
[2018/51]
WO2016JP76673
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018047304
Date:15.03.2018
Language:JA
[2018/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3415746
Date:19.12.2018
Language:EN
[2018/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3415746
Date:17.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.05.2019
ClassificationIPC:F02D41/02, B60W30/02, B60K28/10, F02D29/02, F02P5/15
[2019/23]
CPC:
B60K28/10 (EP,US); B60W30/18145 (EP,US); B60W30/02 (EP,US);
F02D13/06 (EP,US); F02D29/02 (EP,US); F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F02D41/021 (EP,US); F02P5/15 (US); B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP,US); B60W2710/0666 (EP); B60W2710/0672 (EP,US);
F02D17/02 (US); F02D2200/1002 (EP,US); F02D2200/101 (EP,US);
F02D2200/60 (EP,US); F02D2250/26 (EP,US); F02D41/12 (EP,US);
F02P5/1502 (EP); Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Former IPC [2018/51]F02D41/02, B60W30/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2018/51]
English:VEHICLE CONTROL DEVICE[2018/51]
French:DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE[2018/51]
Entry into regional phase14.09.2018Translation filed 
14.09.2018National basic fee paid 
14.09.2018Search fee paid 
14.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
14.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
14.09.2018Examination requested  [2018/51]
18.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2020Fee for grant paid
11.05.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.05.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)18.03.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
25.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.09.2016
AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CY17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
MK17.06.2020
MT17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
TR17.06.2020
IE09.09.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
GB17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/28]HU09.09.2016
AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CY17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MC17.06.2020
MT17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
TR17.06.2020
IE09.09.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
GB17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2022/27]HU09.09.2016
AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CY17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
MT17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
TR17.06.2020
IE09.09.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
GB17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/38]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
IE09.09.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
GB17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/37]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
IE09.09.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
CH30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
LI30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/36]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
BE30.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/35]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
FR30.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/27]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
LU09.09.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/24]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SI17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/21]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
DK17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/10]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
PL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SK17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
IS17.10.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/09]AL17.06.2020
AT17.06.2020
CZ17.06.2020
EE17.06.2020
ES17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
IT17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RO17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
SM17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
PT19.10.2020
Former [2021/04]AL17.06.2020
FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
NL17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2021/01]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
BG17.09.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/51]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
RS17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/50]FI17.06.2020
HR17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
LV17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
GR18.09.2020
Former [2020/48]FI17.06.2020
LT17.06.2020
SE17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
Former [2020/47]LT17.06.2020
NO17.09.2020
Documents cited:Search[A]DE102007026612  (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] ** figure 2 *;
 [A]DE102008054451  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * claim 1 *;
 [A]GB2515105  (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1, 2, 5, 8 * * page 6, line 15 - line 35 *
International search[Y]JPH04219434  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [Y] 1-6;
 [Y]JP2000337196  (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-6 * , fig. 30 & US 5447133 A fig. 32 *;
 [A]JP2006241984  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-6;
 [A]JP2014166014  (MAZDA MOTOR) [A] 1-6* , abstract (Family: none) *
by applicantJP2014166014
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.