Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3472428

EP3472428 - PRESSURIZED NMR CORE ANALYZER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 25.02.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
22.11.2019Change - extension statespublished on 25.12.2019  [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E.
Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / CHONG, Yuan
283 Summerwalk Circle
Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27517 / US
02 / CHEN, Songhua
10102 Stafford Hill Cove Drive
Katy, Texas 77494 / US
03 / LI, Lilong
12422 Huntingwick Drive
Houston, Texas 77024 / US
04 / ZHANG, Lizheng
3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E.
Houston, Texas 77032-3219 / US
 [2019/25]
Former [2019/17]01 / CHONG, Yuan
283 Summerwalk Circle
Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27517 / US
02 / CHEN, Songhua
10102 Stafford Hill Cove Drive
Katy, Texas 77494 / US
03 / LI, Lilong
7327 Bearden Falls Lane
Humble, Texas 77396 / US
04 / ZHANG, Lizheng
3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E.
Houston, Texas 77032-3219 / US
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16916919.020.09.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US52590
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018056946
Date:29.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3472428
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:G01N24/08, E21B47/00, G01V3/14, E21B49/08, E21B25/00, // G01R33/30, G01R33/383
[2019/30]
Former International [2019/17]E21B47/00, G01V3/14, G01R33/44
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
TitleGerman:ANALYSATOR FÜR UNTER DRUCK STEHENDE NMR-KERNE[2019/17]
English:PRESSURIZED NMR CORE ANALYZER[2019/17]
French:ANALYSEUR RMN DE CAROTTES SOUS PRESSION[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase17.01.2019National basic fee paid 
17.01.2019Search fee paid 
17.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
17.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
17.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2011050223  (BALCOM BRUCE [CA], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 2,7,8,10,13 [Y] 6,12,14,15 [I] 3-5;
 [XAYI]US2013335081  (FORDHAM EDMUND J [GB]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * [A] 2,7,8,10,13 [Y] 6,12,14,15 [I] 3-5;
 [XAYI]CN101907586  (PETROCHINA CO LTD) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2,13 [Y] 6,12,14,15 [I] 3-5;
 [Y]WO2013101695  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [Y] 6,12,14,15 * the whole document *;
 [X]US2012146645  (RASCHE VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 7,9 * paragraph [0057]; figure 1 *;
 [X]  - Elliot Jeanne, "IMRISneuro 70 cm Bore 3T in Intra-Operative Neurosurgery", MAGNETOM Flash 3/2009, (2009), pages 74 - 79, URL: http://www.healthcare.siemens.de/siemens_hwem-hwem_ssxa_websites-context-root/wcm/idc/siemens_hwem-hwem_ssxa_websites-context-root/wcm/idc/groups/public/@global/@imaging/@mri/documents/download/mdaw/mtm0/~edisp/imrisneuro_70_cm_bore_3t-00014021.pdf, (20150210), XP055168892 [X] 7 * figures 4,5 *
 [A]  - JONATHAN MITCHELL ET AL, "Contributed Review: Nuclear magnetic resonance core analysis at 0.3 T", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS., US, (20141124), vol. 85, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.4902093, ISSN 0034-6748, page 111502, XP055635717 [A] 7-11 * Sections II and III.B. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.4902093
 [A]  - SARKAR S N ET AL, "MULTINUCLEAR NMR IMAGING OF FLUID PHASES IN BEREA SANDSTONE", JOURNAL OF MAGNETIC RESONANCE. SERIES A, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (199305), vol. 102, no. 3, doi:10.1006/JMRA.1993.1109, ISSN 1064-1858, pages 314 - 317, XP000367388 [A] 7-11 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmra.1993.1109
International search[XY]US2013335081  (FORDHAM EDMUND J [GB]) [X] 1-8 * See paragraphs [0032]-[0036], [0046]-[0047], claim 1, and figures 1-5. * [Y] 9-20;
 [Y]US2015061670  (FORDHAM EDMUND J [GB], et al) [Y] 9-14 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0028], [0031] and figures 2-5. *;
 [Y]US2016109603  (JIN GUODONG [US], et al) [Y] 15-20 * See paragraphs [0019], [0034] and figures 1, 10. *;
 [A]US2014340082  (YANG ZHENG [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0032] and figures 1A-1B. *;
 [A]US2014002081  (MITCHELL JONATHAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0021]-[0023] and claim 9. *