Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469189

EP3469189 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OBTAINING HIGH-RESOLUTION SPECTRAL DATA OF FORMATION FLUIDS FROM OPTICAL COMPUTING DEVICE MEASUREMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E.
Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / DAI, Bin
26126 W. Lovegrass Lane
Spring, Texas 77386 / US
02 / JONES, Christopher Michael
3219 Cobblestone
Houston, Texas 77084 / US
03 / CHEN, Dingding
11511 Bermondsey Drive
Tomball, Texas 77377 / US
04 / SHEN, Jing
9707 Marlive Lane
Houston, Texas 77025 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16916946.322.09.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US53048
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018056976
Date:29.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469189
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.03.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/08, G01V8/02, E21B47/00, G01N21/31, H03M7/30, G06N3/02, // E21B47/10, G01N33/24
[2019/31]
Former International [2019/16]E21B49/08, G01V8/02, E21B47/00, G01N21/31, // E21B47/10, G01N33/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR GEWINNUNG HOCHAUFLÖSENDER SPEKTRALDATEN VON GESTEINSFLÜSSIGKEITEN AUS OPTISCHEN MESSUNGEN MIT COMPUTERVORRICHTUNGEN[2019/16]
English:METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR OBTAINING HIGH-RESOLUTION SPECTRAL DATA OF FORMATION FLUIDS FROM OPTICAL COMPUTING DEVICE MEASUREMENTS[2019/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES DONNÉES SPECTRALES HAUTE RÉSOLUTION DE FLUIDES DE FORMATION À PARTIR DE MESURES DE DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE OPTIQUE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase11.01.2019National basic fee paid 
11.01.2019Search fee paid 
11.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
11.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2016076367  (FREESE ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0012] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] - [0040] * * figures 1,2A * [Y] 5,7 [I] 8;
 [XYI]US2016054285  (FREESE ROBERT P [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0024] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0037] , [0038] * * claims 1,18 * * figure 2 * [Y] 5,7 [I] 6,8;
 [Y]US2004069942  (FUJISAWA GO [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] *;
 [Y]US2014360257  (INDO KENTARO [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0039] - [0042] *;
 [A]WO2015126386  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 11, line 20 - page 15, line 2 * * figure 5 *;
 [Y]US6529276  (MYRICK MICHAEL L [US]) [Y] 9-15 * title * * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 8 * * column 5, line 19 - line 26 * * column 7, line 24 - column 9, line 36 * * column 16, line 6 - line 56 * * column 26, line 18 - column 27, line 10 * * column 29, line 55 - column 30, line 33 * * column 33, line 21 - line 26 * * claim 1 * * figures 3B,9,13A,16 *;
 [Y]CN103247034  (ACADEMY OPTO ELECTRONICS CAS) [Y] 9,10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0011] - [0018] *;
 [Y]US2016146667  (AUGUST YITZHAK [IL], et al) [Y] 9,10 * title * * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [ 0007] , [ 0060] - [0071] * * figures 2,3 *;
 [Y]WO2016108809  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES INC [US]) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0036] , [ 0099] * * abstract *;
 [Y]US2010195105  (MYRICK MICHAEL L [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * title * * paragraphs [0023] - [0025] - [0027] , [0037] , [0039] , [0044] , [0045] * * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2013287061  (FREESE ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 13-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0057] , [0062] , [0064] , [0065] * * claim 4 *
 [Y]  - MO D AND DUARTE M F, "Compressive line spectrum estimation with clustering and interpolation", 2016 ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION SCIENCE AND SYSTEMS (CISS), IEEE, (20160316), doi:10.1109/CISS.2016.7460566, pages 572 - 577, XP032895912 [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CISS.2016.7460566
International search[A]US2013284897  (FREESE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0024], [0052], [0079]-[0082]; and figure 9a-9c. *;
 [A]US2014352953  (GAO LI [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0061]-[0075]; and figures 6-7. *;
 [A]US2006142955  (JONES CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0094]-[0104], [0114]-[0117]; and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2009078860  (KISCHKAT TOBIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0038]-[0042], [0044]-[0048]; and figures 6, 8. *;
 [A]WO2009091763  (BAKER HUGHES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0026], [0032]-[0033]; and figures 2-4. *