Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471944

EP3471944 - DISPENSING POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / EWALD, Brent
Columbia Tech Center
1115 SE 164th Avenue
Columbia Center
Suite 210
Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US
02 / RODE, Michael
Columbia Tech Center
1115 SE 164th Avenue
Columbia Center
Suite 210
Vancouver, Washington 98683 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Fountain Precinct
Balm Green
Sheffield S1 2JA / GB
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16916956.222.09.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US53125
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018056988
Date:29.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471944
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.03.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU29.03.2018
ClassificationInternational:B29C64/255, B29C64/329, G01F11/46
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PULVERAUSGABE[2019/17]
English:DISPENSING POWDER[2019/17]
French:DISTRIBUTION DE POUDRE[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase16.01.2019National basic fee paid 
16.01.2019Search fee paid 
16.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
16.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
16.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[XYA]SU582004  (KALININSKIJ POLITEKHNICHESKIJ INSTITUT) [X] 11, 12 * , col. 2, line 10 -col. 3, line 18, fig. * [Y] 7, 9 [A] 1-6, 8, 10, 13-14
 [Y]SU1690853  (NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNYJ TSENTR PRI NIKOLAEVSKOM KORABLESTROITELNOM IN) [Y] 7, 9 * , claims, phi?r. 1, 2 *
 [A]SU499898  (PODOJNITSYN VIKTOR KHRISANFOVICH) [A] 1-14