Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3471944 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3471944



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 41
16.04.2019 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.04.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
29.03.2019 Request for correction of client data Search / examination 5
27.03.2019 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
31.01.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
29.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
29.01.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.01.2019 Confirmation of effective date of early entry Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
29.03.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
29.03.2018 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 15