Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3471944


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
05.12.2019 Change: Validation states published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
05.12.2019 Change - extension states published on  01.01.2020 [2020/01]
23.09.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.04.2019 Change - applicant published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
10.04.2019 Deletion - The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
10.04.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
22.03.2019 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
22.03.2019 Request for examination filed published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
07.02.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.01.2019 Change - representative
17.01.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
13.04.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
30.03.2018 PCT data prior to European publication