Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3482046

EP3482046 - FREQUENCY SENSORS FOR USE IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.04.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  07.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.12.2019Change: Validation statespublished on 08.01.2020  [2020/02]
06.12.2019Change - extension statespublished on 08.01.2020  [2020/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
3000 N. Sam Houston Parkway E.
Houston, TX 77032-3219 / US
[2019/20]
Inventor(s)01 / PELLETIER, Michael T.
7826 Heather Heights Way
Houston, Texas 77095 / US
02 / GAO, Li
5618 Grandwood Lane
Katy, Texas 77450 / US
 [2019/20]
Representative(s)McWilliams, David John
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2019/20]
Application number, filing date16918003.130.09.2016
[2019/20]
WO2016US54723
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018063309
Date:05.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3482046
Date:15.05.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.04.2018
[2019/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR05.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:E21B49/08, E21B47/00
[2019/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/20]
TitleGerman:FREQUENZSENSOREN ZUR VERWENDUNG IN OPERATIONEN IN UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATIONEN[2019/20]
English:FREQUENCY SENSORS FOR USE IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATION OPERATIONS[2019/20]
French:CAPTEURS DE FRÉQUENCE À UTILISER DANS DES OPÉRATIONS DE FORMATION SOUTERRAINE[2019/20]
Entry into regional phase06.02.2019National basic fee paid 
06.02.2019Search fee paid 
06.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2011303012  (AMUNDSEN LENE [NO], et al) [X] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0002], [0022], [0048]-[0053], [0069] and figures 1, 8. *;
 [A]EP1254352  (HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERV INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0015]-[0017] and figure 1A. *;
 [A]US5796012  (GOMI SHINGO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * See column 3, lines 15-63 and figure 1. *;
 [A]US2016108729  (LI GAO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0037]-[0040] and figure 1. *;
 [A]WO2007143474  (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 30 and figure 3. *