blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP3463894 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201680087421 EP16918393



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
WO2018067105Global Dossier 12.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US55133 03.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2019210361Global Dossier 11.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US55133 03.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2019519408Global Dossier 11.07.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2016US55133 03.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN109562620Global Dossier 02.04.2019A
Priority number Date
WO2016US55133 03.10.2016
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3463894Global Dossier 10.04.2019A1
Priority number Date
WO2016US55133 03.10.2016