Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3463894

EP3463894 - CONTROLLING RECIRCULATING OF NOZZLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/15]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARTIN, Eric
1070 NE Circle Boulevard
Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US
02 / KORTHUIS, Vincent C.
1070 NE Circle Boulevard
Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date16918393.603.10.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016US55133
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018067105
Date:12.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3463894
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.04.2018
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU12.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/01, B41J2/18
[2019/15]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STEUERUNG DER RÜCKFÜHRUNG VON DÜSEN[2019/15]
English:CONTROLLING RECIRCULATING OF NOZZLES[2019/15]
French:COMMANDE DE RECIRCULATION DE BUSES[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase02.01.2019National basic fee paid 
02.01.2019Search fee paid 
02.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
02.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
02.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008186344  (HARA KATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US2005230493  (BENJAMIN TRUDY L [US], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US2011279558  (HIBBARD CHRISTOPHER [AU], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]EP2918417  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-15