Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468248

EP3468248 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD.
No.18, Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN
[2019/15]
Inventor(s)01 / YANG, Ning
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
02 / LIN, Yanan
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
03 / TANG, Hai
No.18 Haibin Road
Wusha
Chang'an
Dongguan Guangdong 523860 / CN
 [2019/15]
Representative(s)Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Martin-Greif-Strasse 1
80336 München / DE
[2019/15]
Application number, filing date16918591.514.10.2016
[2019/15]
WO2016CN102174
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018068320
Date:19.04.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468248
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN19.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W28/16, H04W72/04
[2019/25]
Former International [2019/15]H04W28/16
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/15]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM[2019/15]
English:COMMUNICATION METHOD AND DEVICE, AND COMMUNICATION SYSTEM[2019/15]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, ET SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION[2019/15]
Entry into regional phase07.01.2019Translation filed 
07.01.2019National basic fee paid 
07.01.2019Search fee paid 
07.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
07.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
07.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]CN104981021  (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH) [X] 1,3-10,12-15 * abstract * [A] 2,11;
 EP3133853  [ ] (CHINA ACADEMY TELECOMMUNICATIONS TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0098] - paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0114] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0125] - paragraph [0126] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0130] * * paragraph [0144] - paragraph [0144] * * figure 4 *;
 [XA]US2006109865  (PARK SEUNG-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,9,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0126] * * figures 1-3, 10 * [A] 2-8,10-13,15
 [XA]  - ZTE, "Geo based Resource Allocation for V2V over PC5", vol. RAN WG2, no. Nanjing, China; 20160523 - 20160527, (20160522), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-163824 GEO BASED RESOURCE ALLOCATION FOR V2V OVER PC5, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; F, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20160522), XP051105230 [X] 1,3-6,9,10,12-15 * paragraph [02.1] - paragraph [02.1] * * paragraph [2.1.1] - paragraph [2.1.1] * * paragraph [2.2.1] - paragraph [2.2.1] * * figure 2 * [A] 2,7,8,11