Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524601

EP3524601 - N-{3-[3-CYCLOPROPYL-5-(2-FLUORO-4-IODOPHENYLAMINO)-6,8-DIMETHYL-2,4,7-TRIOXO-3,4,6,7-TETRAHYDRO-2H-PYRIDO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDIN-1-YL]-PHENYL}-CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDE DIMETHYL SULPHOXIDE SOLVATE AS AN MEK1/2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R-Pharm Joint Stock Company (R-Pharm, JSC)
Berzarina str. 19 bld. 1
Moscow 123154 / RU
For all designated states
Repik, Alexey Evgenievich
Osenniy Boulevard
3-106
Moscow 121609 / RU
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / REPIK, Alexey Evgenievich
54 Kotoroslnaya nab., Apt. 9
Yaroslavl, 150000 / RU
02 / IVACHTCHENKO, Alexandre Vasilievich
E. Hallandale Bch Blvd 1835 442
Hallandale Beach Florida 33009 / US
03 / IGNATIEV, Vasily Gennadievich
Skolkovskoye Shosse 13 Apt. 212
Moscow 121353 / RU
04 / CHAFEEV, Mikhail Airatovich
Gogolia Str. 9 Apt. 73
Moscow region Khimki 141401 / RU
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Osmans, Voldemars , et al
Agency Tria Robit
P.O. Box 22
LV-1010 Riga / LV
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date16918763.012.12.2016
[2019/33]
WO2016RU00862
Priority number, dateRU2016013964110.10.2016         Original published format: RU 2016139641
[2019/33]
Filing languageRU
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018070900
Date:19.04.2018
Language:RU
[2018/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3524601
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU19.04.2018
ClassificationInternational:C07D471/04, A61K31/519, A61P35/00
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBA09.05.2019
ME09.05.2019
Validation statesMA09.05.2019
MD09.05.2019
TitleGerman:N-{3-[3-CYCLOPROPYL-5-(2-FLUOR-4-IODOPHENYLAMINO)-6,8-DIMETHYL-2,4,7-TRIOXO-3,4,6,7-TETRAHYDRO-2H-PYRIDO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDIN-1-YL]-PHENYL}-CYCLOPROPANCARBOXAMID-DIMETHYLSULFOXID-SOLVAT ALS MEK1/2-INHIBITOR[2019/33]
English:N-{3-[3-CYCLOPROPYL-5-(2-FLUORO-4-IODOPHENYLAMINO)-6,8-DIMETHYL-2,4,7-TRIOXO-3,4,6,7-TETRAHYDRO-2H-PYRIDO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDIN-1-YL]-PHENYL}-CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDE DIMETHYL SULPHOXIDE SOLVATE AS AN MEK1/2 INHIBITOR[2019/33]
French:SOLVATE DE DIMÉTHYLSULFOXYDE N-{3-[3-CYCLOPROPYL-5-(2-FLUORO-4-IODOPHÉNYLAMINO)-6,8-DIMÉTHYL-2,4,7-TRIOXO-3,4,6,7-TÉTRAHYDRO-2N-PYRIDO[4,3-D]PYRIMIDIN-1-YL]-PHÉNYL}- CYCLOPROPANECARBOXAMIDE UTILISÉ EN TANT QUE INHIBITEUR DE MEK1/2[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase09.05.2019Translation filed 
09.05.2019National basic fee paid 
09.05.2019Search fee paid 
09.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
09.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US7378423  (KAWASAKI HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , pephiepatau, ??????? 1-25 ????????, ??????a 145 nepBoe ??????????, ??????a 191 coe??????e 59, ??????a 192 npHMep 4-3, ??????a 261 *;
 [A]WO2014066606  (GLAXOSMITHKLINE LLC [US]) [A] 1-10 * , pe?????, ??????a ???????????, c.14 ?????? 9-14 *
 [A]  - HYKOUK1 ABE et al., "Discovery or a Highly Potent and selective MbK Inhibitor: GSK1120212 (JTP-74057 DMSO Solvate", ACS Medicinal Chemistry Letters, (20110000), vol. 2, pages 3 20 - 324, XP055209291 [A] 1-10 * , pe?epa?, c.321 coe??????? 1 (??????? a????), c. 323 ??????? 1 H 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ml200004g
by applicantWO2005121142
 WO2012088033
 US7378423
    - H. ABE, S. KIKUCHIK. HAYAKAWA et al., ACS Med. Chem. Lett., (20110000), vol. 2, pages 320 - 324