Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3471865

EP3471865 - DROPLET GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/17]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / TORNIAINEN, Erik D.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
02 / GOVYADINOV, Alexander N.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
03 / KORNILOVICH, Pavel
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
04 / MARKEL, David P.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
05 / SEAVER, Richard W.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16919485.921.10.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016US58235
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018075069
Date:26.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3471865
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2018
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU26.04.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:B01F13/00, G01N33/48
[2019/17]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TRÖPFCHENERZEUGER[2019/17]
English:DROPLET GENERATOR[2019/17]
French:GÉNÉRATEUR DE GOUTTELETTES[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase15.01.2019National basic fee paid 
15.01.2019Search fee paid 
15.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
15.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
15.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2010018584  (BRANSKY AVISHAY [IL], et al) [X] 1-9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0091] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0117] * * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0133] * * figures 1,2,6, 9, 17 * [A] 10,12;
 [XA]EP1362634  (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,13-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0067] * * figures 1-8,10-15,20-23 * [A] 7,10,12;
 [X]US2014323317  (LINK DARREN R [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0116] - paragraph [0119] * * paragraph [0126] * * figures 1,4,10,16 *;
 [XA]US2012236299  (CHIOU PEI-YU [US], et al) [X] 1-9,13-15 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0082] * * figures 1A,3-8 * [A] 10-12
 [X]  - AVISHAY BRANSKY ET AL, "A microfluidic droplet generator based on a piezoelectric actuator", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, vol. 9, doi:10.1039/B814810D, ISSN 1473-0197, (20090101), pages 516 - 520, (20081120), XP007907228 [X] 1-9,11,13-15 * page 516, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 516, column 2, paragraph 4 * * page 517, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 9 * * figures 1,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b814810d
International search[XA]US9108173  (LEE DENZ [TW], et al) [X] 1, 14 * , column 1, lines 13-50, column 6, lines 44-57, column 7, lines 30-39, column 8, lines 54-59 * [A] 2-13, 15;
 [A]WO2011090396  (INST CHEMII FIZYCZNEJ POLSKIEJ AKADEMII NAUK [PL], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US2016008778  (WEITZ DAVID A [US], et al) [A] 1-15