Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525021

EP3525021 - FUSION SPLICE PROTECTOR, DISTRIBUTION FRAME AND FIBER-OPTIC CABINET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.10.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / ZHONG, Laichong
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / LI, Yun
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / YANG, Anliang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / XIONG, Wei
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Goddar, Heinz J.
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date16919818.127.10.2016
[2019/33]
WO2016CN103644
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018076249
Date:03.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525021
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN03.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:G02B6/44, G02B6/255
[2019/35]
Former International [2019/33]G02B6/38, G02B6/255
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUSIONSSPLEISSSCHUTZ, VERTEILUNGSRAHMEN UND FASEROPTISCHES GEHÄUSE[2019/33]
English:FUSION SPLICE PROTECTOR, DISTRIBUTION FRAME AND FIBER-OPTIC CABINET[2019/33]
French:PROTECTEUR D'ÉPISSURE PAR FUSION, CADRE DE DISTRIBUTION ET ARMOIRE À FIBRES OPTIQUES[2019/33]
Entry into regional phase10.05.2019Translation filed 
10.05.2019National basic fee paid 
10.05.2019Search fee paid 
10.05.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.05.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.05.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014348481  (GIRAUD WILLIAM JULIUS MCPHIL [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * figures 1-3, 15, 16, 20-27 * * paragraphs [0062] , [ 0063] , [ 0084] , [ 0112] * [I] 5-7;
 [A]US2014348480  (GIRAUD WILLIAM JULIUS MCPHIL [US], et al) [A] 5-7 * figure 2 * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] *;
 [A]CN105093416  (NINGBO LONGXING TELECOMM EQUIPMENT MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2011268414  (GIRAUD WILLIAM J [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1, 13-15 *;
 [A]US2016216471  (GIRAUD WILLIAM JULIUS MCPHIL [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1A, 1B, 2A, 2B *;
 [A]US2009324189  (HILL JOHN P [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 *