Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468806

EP3468806 - FLUID EJECTION DEVICE WITH FIRE PULSE GROUPS INCLUDING WARMING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive W.
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MARTIN, Eric
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US
02 / KORTHUIS, Vincent C.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)EIP
EIP Europe LLP
Fairfax House
15 Fulwood Place
London WC1V 6HU / GB
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16920209.026.10.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US58869
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018080479
Date:03.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468806
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.05.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU03.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/175, B41J2/165
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG MIT AUSLÖSEIMPULSGRUPPEN EINSCHLIESSLICH ERWÄRMUNGSDATEN[2019/16]
English:FLUID EJECTION DEVICE WITH FIRE PULSE GROUPS INCLUDING WARMING DATA[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉJECTION DE FLUIDE À GROUPES D'IMPULSIONS DE DÉCLENCHEMENT COMPRENANT DES DONNÉES DE RÉCHAUFFEMENT[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2016089371  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.) [A] 1-15
 [A]WO2015191060  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.) [A] 1-15
 [A]WO2016130157  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMAPNY, L.P.) [A] 1-15
 [A]WO2016068898  (HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.) [A] 1-15