Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3469873

EP3469873 - WORKING VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  05.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 09.10.2019 [2019/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Honda Motor Co., Ltd.
1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 107-8556 / JP
[2019/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KASAI Koji
c/o HONDA R&D Co. Ltd.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
02 / SASAKI Hideshi
c/o HONDA R&D Co. Ltd.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
03 / OKUBO Susumu
c/o HONDA R&D Co. Ltd.
4-1 Chuo 1-chome
Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Beder, Jens
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16920291.831.10.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016JP82343
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018078879
Date:03.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3469873
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:A01D34/73, A01D34/82
[2019/41]
Former International [2019/16]A01D34/73
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NUTZFAHRZEUG[2019/16]
English:WORKING VEHICLE[2019/16]
French:VÉHICULE DE TRAVAIL[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019Translation filed 
10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]JP2016185091  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , & US 2016/0278289 A1 & EP 3075221 A1 *;
 [A]JP3966834B  (Kubota Corp.) [A] 1-3 * , & JP 2004-337047 A *;
 [A]JPS5816014U  (Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-3 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS428979Y  (Hiroyoshi KAWAGUCHI) [A] 1-3 * , (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS6325960Y  (Maruyama Mfg. Co., Inc.) [A] 1-3 * , (Family: none) *