Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3536780 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3536780



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 714
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
23.07.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.07.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.07.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
12.06.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
21.05.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.04.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
24.04.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.04.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.04.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Annex Search / examination 5
24.04.2019 Claims Search / examination 5
24.04.2019 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 280
24.04.2019 Description Search / examination 40
24.04.2019 Drawings Search / examination 1
24.04.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
19.03.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
19.03.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.03.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
11.05.2018 Converted Sequence Listing Search / examination 289
11.05.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
11.05.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 4
11.05.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 26