Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3536780


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.11.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.08.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019 Request for examination filed published on  11.09.2019  [2019/37]
15.07.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
12.06.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
10.05.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
01.05.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.04.2019 Amendment by applicant
24.04.2019 Change - representative
24.04.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
15.04.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
25.03.2019 PCT data prior to European publication
18.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication
11.05.2018 PCT data prior to European publication