Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536780

EP3536780 - PROLINE HYDROXYLASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Asymchem Laboratories (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.
No. 6 Dongting 3rd Street
TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
For all designated states
Asymchem Life Science (Tianjin) Co., Ltd.
No. 71, 7th Avenue
TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
For all designated states
Tianjin Asymchem Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd.
No. 71, Xinye 7th Avenue
TEDA West
Tianjin 300462 / CN
For all designated states
Asymchem Laboratories (Fuxin) Co., Ltd.
No. 90, Development Avenue
Fuxin High-tech
Industrial Development Zone
Fuxin, Liaoning 123000 / CN
For all designated states
Jilin Asymchem Laboratories Co., Ltd.
No.99 Hongda Road
Economic Development Zone
Dunhua, Jilin 133700 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HONG, Hao
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
02 / JAMES, Gage
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
03 / LU, Jiangping
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
04 / ZHANG, Na
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
05 / YU, Wenyan
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
06 / LIU, Fang
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
07 / LI, Yanjun
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
08 / HUANG, Xin
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
09 / GAO, Juan
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
10 / ZHANG, Kejian
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
11 / MA, Yulei
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
12 / WEI, Junlu
No. 71 7th Street TEDA
Tianjin 300457 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Biggi, Cristina
Bugnion S.p.A.
Viale Lancetti 17
20158 Milano / IT
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date16920642.204.11.2016
[2019/37]
WO2016CN104670
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082030
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536780
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/02, C12N15/53, C12N1/21, C12P13/24, C12R1/19
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:PROLINHYDROXYLASE UND ANWENDUNG DAVON[2019/37]
English:PROLINE HYDROXYLASE AND APPLICATION THEREOF[2019/37]
French:PROLINE HYDROXYLASE ET APPLICATION CORRESPONDANTE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase24.04.2019Translation filed 
24.04.2019National basic fee paid 
24.04.2019Search fee paid 
24.04.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.04.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04