Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3468802

EP3468802 - FLUID EJECTION DEVICE INCLUDING FLUID OUTPUT CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.03.2019
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.04.2019Change - applicantpublished on 15.05.2019  [2019/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
10300 Energy Drive
Spring TX 77389 / US
[2019/20]
Former [2019/16]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, Texas 77070 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CUMBIE, Michael W
HP Inc.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
02 / CHEN, Chien-Hua
HP Inc.
1070 NE Circle Blvd.
Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US
 [2019/16]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Eva
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[2019/16]
Application number, filing date16920696.801.11.2016
[2019/16]
WO2016US59864
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018084826
Date:11.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3468802
Date:17.04.2019
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2018
[2019/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:RU11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/045, B41J2/055, B41J2/135
[2019/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/16]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG MIT FLÜSSIGKEITSAUSGABEKANAL[2019/16]
English:FLUID EJECTION DEVICE INCLUDING FLUID OUTPUT CHANNEL[2019/16]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉJECTION DE FLUIDE COMPRENANT UN CANAL DE SORTIE DE FLUIDE[2019/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2019National basic fee paid 
10.01.2019Search fee paid 
10.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
10.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[A]US6283584  (POWERS JAMES HAROLD [US], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]US8998388  (CATTANEO MAURO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15;
 [A]JP2008073898  (RICOH KK) [A] 1-15;
 [A]RU2203808  (EHJSER KOMM JUNIKEJSHNZ EHND M [CN]) [A] 1-15