Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3537254 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3537254



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 247
24.10.2019 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
23.10.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.10.2019 Final instructions in case of withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
16.10.2019 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
11.10.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
14.08.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
07.06.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.05.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 4
21.05.2019 Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
06.03.2019 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
25.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
25.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
25.02.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 31
25.02.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 31
25.02.2019 Annex Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
25.02.2019 Description Search / examination 23
25.02.2019 Drawings Search / examination 30
25.02.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.06.2018 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
11.05.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.05.2018 Copy of the translated international search report Search / examination 2
11.05.2018 International publication pamphlet Search / examination 85