Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537254

EP3537254 - TRIGGER APPARATUS, DIAL PLATE AND SMART WRISTBAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  18.10.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shenzhen Royole Technologies Co., Ltd.
Room 320
Overseas High-Tech Venture Park
1, Qinglin West Road
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518172 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / LIAO, Le
A4-1501
Kexing Science Park
No.15 Keyuan Rd.
Science and Technology Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN
02 / XIA, Xinyuan
A4-1501
Kexing Science Park
No.15 Keyuan Rd.
Science and Technology Park, Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518052 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date16920777.602.11.2016
[2019/37]
WO2016CN104344
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018081950
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537254
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:G06F1/16
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AUSLÖSEVORRICHTUNG, ZIFFERBLATT UND INTELLIGENTES ARMBAND[2019/37]
English:TRIGGER APPARATUS, DIAL PLATE AND SMART WRISTBAND[2019/37]
French:APPAREIL DE DÉCLENCHEMENT, PLAQUE-CADRAN ET BRACELET INTELLIGENT[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2019Translation filed 
25.02.2019National basic fee paid 
25.02.2019Search fee paid 
25.02.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.02.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
16.10.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03