Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536422

EP3536422 - DETECTION AND REPAIR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POWDER ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
09.08.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tongtai Machine & Tool Co., Ltd.
No.3, Luke 3rd Road
Luzhu District
Kaohsiung City 82151 / TW
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Yihsien
No.3. Luke 3rd Rd.
Luzhu
Kaohsiung 82151 / TW
02 / CHEN, HsinPao
No.3. Luke 3rd Rd.
Luzhu
Kaohsiung 82151 / TW
03 / YEN, Juihsiung
No.3. Luke 3rd Rd.
Luzhu
Kaohsiung 82151 / TW
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz
Partnerschaft mbB
Bettinastraße 53-55
60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date16920923.607.11.2016
[2019/37]
WO2016CN104907
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018082097
Date:11.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536422
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.05.2018
ClassificationInternational:B22F3/105, B33Y30/00, G01N21/84
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DETEKTIONS- UND REPARATURVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GENERATIVEN FERTIGUNG MIT PULVER[2019/37]
English:DETECTION AND REPAIR DEVICE AND METHOD FOR POWDER ADDITIVE MANUFACTURING[2019/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION ET DE RÉPARATION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ADDITIVE BASÉE SUR POUDRE[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2019Translation filed 
11.03.2019National basic fee paid 
11.03.2019Search fee paid 
11.03.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03