blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3540765

EP3540765 - RESIN-SEALING DEVICE AND RESIN-SEALING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.03.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.04.2021  [2021/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SHIN-ETSU ENGINEERING Co., Ltd.
9, Kanda Nishikicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
[2019/38]
Inventor(s)01 / OHTANI Yoshikazu
c/o SHIN-ETSU ENGINEERING CO. LTD.
2-45 Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi Gunma 379-0127 / JP
02 / MORI Hiroharu
c/o SHIN-ETSU ENGINEERING CO. LTD.
9 Kanda Nishikicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI Hiroshi
c/o SHIN-ETSU ENGINEERING CO. LTD.
9 Kanda Nishikicho 2-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 101-0054 / JP
 [2019/38]
Representative(s)Tomkinson, Alexandra
Bailey Walsh & Co LLP
1 York Place
Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB
[2019/38]
Application number, filing date16921421.011.11.2016
[2019/38]
WO2016JP83590
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2018087894
Date:17.05.2018
Language:JA
[2018/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3540765
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP17.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:B29C33/14, H01L21/56, B29C33/18, // B29L31/34, B29C70/78
[2020/20]
CPC:
B29C33/14 (EP,US); B29C33/18 (EP,KR,US); H01L21/565 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/56 (US); H01L21/561 (EP,US); H01L21/67126 (KR);
B29C2037/90 (KR); B29C70/78 (EP,US); B29L2031/3406 (KR,US);
B29L2031/3425 (EP,KR,US); H01L21/566 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2019/38]H01L21/56, B29C33/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/38]
TitleGerman:HARZVERSIEGELUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HARZVERSIEGELUNGSVERFAHREN[2019/38]
English:RESIN-SEALING DEVICE AND RESIN-SEALING METHOD[2019/38]
French:DISPOSITIF D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ EN RÉSINE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ EN RÉSINE[2019/38]
Entry into regional phase01.11.2018Translation filed 
26.09.2018National basic fee paid 
26.09.2018Search fee paid 
26.09.2018Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2018Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2018Examination requested  [2019/38]
10.11.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/16]
02.12.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2021/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.202005   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]US2013115735  (CHEN MENG-TSE [TW], et al) [Y] 1-5 * Claim 17; para.[0026, 0028, 0032, 0037-0040]; fig. 6, 7, 9 *;
 [Y]US2015041993  (PALM PETTERI [DE]) [Y] 1,3-5 * Para. [0130]; fig. 3a, 3b *;
 [Y]US2009221114  (XU JIANWEN [US]) [Y] 1,3,5 * Para. [0023-0025]; fig. 2 *;
 [Y]US2006186576  (TAKASE SHINJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,3,5 * Para. [0049-0052, 0079]; fig. 15 *;
 [Y]US6482287  (DE GAULLE ANTOINE [FR]) [Y] 2,3 * Claim 1-4; fig. 3 *;
 [A]WO9727624  (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * P. 12, l. 22-27; fig. 4, 6 *;
 [A]JP2005064456  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * Para. [0088]; fig. 1-8 *;
 [A]KR20100126910  (SECRON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5 * Para. [0024]; fig. 5-8 *;
 [A]WO2015087763  (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * Fig. 4, 13-19 *
International search[A]JP2005064456  (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0070] to [0098]; fig. 6, 7 & US 2005/0026418 A1 paragraphs [0089] to [0118]; fig. 6, 7 *;
 [A]JP2014075443  (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0021] to [0060]; fig. 1 & US 2014/0091483 A1 paragraphs [0038] to [0093]; fig. 1 & CN 103715105 A & KR 10-2014-0043878 A & TW 201415561 A *;
 [A]JP2013012573  (TOWA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , paragraph [0031]; fig. 1 & CN 102848515 A & KR 10-2013-0007458 A & TW 201301411 A *;
 [A]JP2014019086  (TOWA CORP) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0023] to [0036]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.