Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537344

EP3537344 - SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON SPIKING NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  11.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.11.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Ming
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / YAN, Zheng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / XUE, Xijun
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
MTH The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date16922469.828.11.2016
[2019/37]
WO2016CN107419
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018094717
Date:31.05.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537344
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN31.05.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/02, G06N3/04, G06N3/063, G06N3/08
[2019/50]
Former International [2019/37]G06N3/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG AUF BASIS EINES NEURONALEN NETZES[2019/37]
English:SIGNAL PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE BASED ON SPIKING NEURAL NETWORK[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL BASÉS SUR UN RÉSEAU NEURONAL IMPULSIONNEL[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase05.06.2019Translation filed 
05.06.2019National basic fee paid 
05.06.2019Search fee paid 
05.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03