Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3537746

EP3537746 - SERVICE INDICATION METHOD, BASE STATION, TERMINAL, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2019Supplementary search reportpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / XIONG, Jianqiang
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / XIE, Liuying
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / LIU, Yuehui
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date16923081.030.11.2016
[2019/37]
WO2016CN108165
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018098764
Date:07.06.2018
Language:ZH
[2018/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3537746
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN07.06.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04W16/02, H04L5/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/37]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:DIENSTANZEIGEVERFAHREN, BASISSTATION, ENDGERÄT UND SYSTEM[2019/37]
English:SERVICE INDICATION METHOD, BASE STATION, TERMINAL, AND SYSTEM[2019/37]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'INDICATION DE SERVICE, STATION DE BASE, TERMINAL ET SYSTÈME[2019/37]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2019Translation filed 
06.06.2019National basic fee paid 
06.06.2019Search fee paid 
06.06.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.06.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[IA]  - NEW POSTCOM, "Discussion on MFBI UE measurement", vol. RAN WG2, no. Chicago, USA; 20130415 - 20130419, (20130406), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-130999_DISCUSSION ON MFBI UE MEASUREMENT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_81bis/Docs/, (20130406), XP050699407 [I] 1,3,8,12 * the whole document * [A] 2,4-7,9-11,13-15
 [A]  - SAMSUNG, "Invalid measurement configuration with different (E)-ARFCN", vol. RAN WG2, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121103), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-125806, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_80/Docs/, (20121103), XP050667519 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *