Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3473832

EP3473832 - TURBINE AND TURBOCHARGER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.03.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2020Supplementary search reportpublished on 12.02.2020 [2020/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Engine & Turbocharger, Ltd.
3000 Tana
Chuo-ku
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 252-5293 / JP
[2019/17]
Inventor(s)01 / YOSHIDA, Toyotaka
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-Chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
02 / OZAKI, Makoto
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES
ENGINE&TURBOCHARGER LTD.
3000 Tana
Chuo-ku
Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 252-5293 / JP
03 / YOKOYAMA, Takao
c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES LTD.
16-5 Konan 2-Chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8215 / JP
 [2019/17]
Representative(s)Mader, Joachim
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/17]
Application number, filing date16925270.728.12.2016
[2019/17]
WO2016JP89175
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2018123045
Date:05.07.2018
Language:JA
[2018/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3473832
Date:24.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.07.2018
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2020
ClassificationInternational:F02B39/00, F01D5/12, F01D5/04, F01D9/02, F02B37/00
[2020/07]
Former International [2019/17]F02B39/00, F01D5/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/17]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TURBINE UND TURBOLADER[2019/17]
English:TURBINE AND TURBOCHARGER[2019/17]
French:TURBINE ET TURBOCOMPRESSEUR[2019/17]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2019Translation filed 
21.01.2019National basic fee paid 
21.01.2019Search fee paid 
21.01.2019Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2019Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedDate on which the examining division has become responsible
21.01.2019Examination requested  [2019/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[YA]JP2015124743  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 1, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0007], [0017] to [0032]; fig. 1 to 9 & US 2016/0319683 A1 paragraphs [0009], [0033] to [0057]; fig. 1 to 9 & WO 2015/099199 A1 & EP 3088700 A1 & KR 10-2016-0106576 A & CN 105940204 A * [A] 2-3;
 [YA]JPS6334328U  (Toyota Motor Corp.) [Y] 1, 4-5 * , page 4, line 1 to page 6, line 13; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3;
 [YA]JP2016132996  (IHI CORP) [Y] 1, 4-5 * , paragraphs [0016] to [0020]; fig. 2 (Family: none) * [A] 2-3;
 [A]JP2011231780  (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2000045784  (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JP2015183670  (IHI CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPS53136113  (WALLACE MURRAY CORP) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & DE 2813638 A1 & FR 2389760 A1 & SE 7801452 A & BR 7802094 A *;
 [A]US2012051899  (PETITJEAN DOMINIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text; all drawings & EP 2423445 A2 & CN 102383874 A *